Dogfen lywodraethu INSPIRED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 11/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF AGE, GENDER, DISABILITY, LANGUAGE AND ETHNIC ORIGIN AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY: 1.1. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY AND ASSISTING NEW ARRIVALS TO THE UK WITH INTEGRATION INTO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THROUGH THE FACILITATION OF COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS. 1.2. PROVIDING ADVICE, EDUCATION, COUNSELLING, BEFRIENDING, ADVOCACY AND REPRESENTATION. 2. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THOUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ANY OR ALL THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 2.1 MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.2 OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; 2.3 RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; 2.4 RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 2.5 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.6 PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; 2.7 CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; 2.8 RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 2.9 PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.10 PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONGST INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; 2.11 INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS 2.12 ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER 1) TO WORK TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF VIOLENT RELIGIOUS EXTREMISM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AWARENESS RAISING WORKSHOPS, TRAINING AND SEMINARS. 2) TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
UK AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.