THIRD SECTOR NATIONAL LEARNING ALLIANCE LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Acting as a national voice for the third sector in learning and skills Champion the unique role of third sector providers in reaching those people at most disadvantage Enable the exchange of information and best practice so that providers continue to improve the quality of learning delivered Work with all other sectors and agencies to ensure the effective delivery of good quality learning
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 21 Mawrth 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Mawrth 2022: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- TSNLA (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £18.54k | £39.73k | £64.13k | £51.70k | £17.84k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £34.57k | £46.30k | £75.12k | £52.11k | £21.71k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £5.87k | £7.38k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 21 Ebrill 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2018 | 17 Medi 2019 | 79 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2018 | 17 Medi 2019 | 79 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/03/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING LEARNING AND SKILLS SERVICES BY. 3.1 ACTING AS A NATIONAL VOICE FOR THIRD SECTOR PROVIDERS OF LEARNING AND SKILLS SERVICES; 3.2 ENABLING THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND BEST PRACTICE AMONGST THIRD SECTOR LEARNING AND SKILLS PROVIDERS; 3.3 PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THIRD SECTOR LEARNING AND SKILLS PROVISION; AND 3.4 PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO LEARNING AND SKILLS PROVIDED BY THE THIRD SECTOR AND PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH. ('THIRD SECTOR' MEANS VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS, CHARITIES AND OTHER FORMS OF SOCIAL ENTERPRISE FOR PUBLIC AND COMMUNITY BENEFIT WHOSE CONSTITUTIONS PROHIBIT THE DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window