KIPEPEO DESIGNS LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Kipepeo Designs (KD) works in partnership with Kipepeo designs Trust engaging people living in poverty in Kenya to produce greetings cards. The cards are distributed throughout the UK by (Kipepeo Designs Trading) Ltd.. KD also provide education in areas including business management to help people to be independent. Christianity is promoted through devotions and Bible study.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Cenia
Llywodraethu
- 10 Tachwedd 2011: Cofrestrwyd
- 01 Ebrill 2021: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £4.29k | £4.72k | £2.47k | £3.11k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £828 | £5.00k | £4.01k | £4.35k | £55 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | 21 Hydref 2019 | 143 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | 29 Mai 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUL 2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4.1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN KENYA, OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH (I) OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMPLOYMENT AND LEARNING; AND/OR (II) GOODS AND/OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 4.2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN KENYA, OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. THIS INCLUDES SKILLS WHICH PROVIDE THE POTENTIAL FOR INCOME GENERATION AND BUSINESS SKILLS WITH WHICH TO ENSURE SUSTAINABILITY 4.3)TO PROMOTE AND UPHOLD THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window