FREE 2 BE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
TO EMPOWER AND INSPIRE PEOPLE TO BELIEVE THEY CAN BE ALL THEY WERE CREATED TO BE. PROVIDING BUSINESS TRAINING AND MICRO-FINANCE TO POOR & DISADVANTAGED KENYANS. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT FOR SCHOOLS, UNIFORMS AND CLASSROOMS FOR AIDS ORPHANS, WATER HARVESTING AND OTHER SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF LIVING. BELIEVING A HAND-UP ENABLES AND BRINGS INDEPENDENCE BUT HAND-OUTS DISABLE AND CAUSE DEPENDENCE.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Llety/tai
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Affganistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigwa A Barbuda
- Ariannin
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Aserbaijan
- Awstralia
- Awstria
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarws
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhwtan
- Bolifia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brasil
- Brunei
- Burkina Faso
- Bwlgaria
- Bwrwndi
- Byrma
- Cabo Verde
- Caledonia Newydd
- Cambodia
- Camerwn
- Canada
- Cenia
- Chile
- Ciwba
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Gweriniaeth Ddemocrataidd)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- De Affrica
- De Corea
- De Georgia
- Dekelia
- Denmarc
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Ecwador
- El Salvador
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- Feneswela
- Ffiji
- Ffrainc
- Fiet-nam
- Gabon
- Gaiana
- Georgia
- Gerner
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Gogledd Corea
- Grenada
- Groeg
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guinea Gyhydeddol
- Guiné-bissau
- Guinée
- Guyan Ffrengig
- Gweriniaeth Canol Affrica
- Gweriniaeth De Swdan
- Gwlad Belg
- Gwlad Pwyl
- Gwlad Swazi
- Gwlad Thai
- Gwlad Yr Iâ
- Haiti
- Hondwras
- Hong Kong
- Hwngari
- India
- Indonesia
- Iorddonen
- Irac
- Iran
- Ireland
- Israel
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Kazakstan
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latfia
- Lesotho
- Libanus
- Liberia
- Libia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithwania
- Lwcsembwrg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagasgar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mecsico
- Micronesia
- Moldofa
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Moroco
- Mosambic
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Nicaragwa
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norwy
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua Guinea Newydd
- Paraguai
- Periw
- Philipinas
- Polynesia Ffrengig
- Portiwgal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Reunion
- Rwanda
- Rwmania
- Rwsia
- Samoa
- Samoa America
- San Marino
- São Tomé A Príncipe
- Sawdi-arabia
- Sbaen
- Seland Newydd
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slofacia
- Slofenia
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- St Barthelemy
- St Helena
- St Kitts-nevis
- St Lucia
- St Martin
- St Pierre A Miquelon
- St Vincent A Grenadines
- Surinam
- Svalbard
- Sweden
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Tchad
- Tiriogaethau Palesteina
- Tiriogaeth Brydeinig Cefnfor India
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tomor-leste
- Tonga
- Trinidad A Tobago
- Tsieina
- Tunisia
- Turkmenistan
- Twfalw
- Twrci
- Uganda
- Ukrain
- Unol Daleithiau
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Wallis A Futuna
- Wrwgwâi
- Y Bahamas
- Y Comoros
- Yemen
- Y Ffindir
- Y Gambia
- Ynys Christmas
- Ynys Gogledd Mariana
- Ynys Manaw
- Ynys Norfolk
- Ynysoedd Cayman
- Ynysoedd Coco (KEELING)
- Ynysoedd Cook
- Ynysoedd Falkland
- Ynysoedd Faroe
- Ynysoedd Marshall
- Ynysoedd Solomon
- Ynysoedd Turks A Caicos
- Ynysoedd Virgin Prydain
- Ynysoedd Virgin Yr Unol Daleithiau
- Ynys Pitcairn
- Ynys Y Pasg
- Yr Aifft
- Yr Almaen
- Yr Eidal
- Yr Emiraethau Arabaidd Unedig
- Yr Iseldiroedd
- Yr Ynys Las
- Y Swdan
- Y Swistir
- Y Traeth Ifori
- Y Weriniaeth Ddominicaidd
- Y Weriniaeth Tsiec
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Llywodraethu
- 12 Rhagfyr 2011: Cofrestrwyd
- 06 Rhagfyr 2013: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- FREE 2 BE (Enw gwaith)
- FREE 2 BE MINISTRIES (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £21.11k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £13.90k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2013 | 15 Mai 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/02/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GOOD NEWS CHILDREN CENTRE SCHOOL, WEBUYE AND MAKATANO CHURCH SCHOOL (BUT NOT LIMITED TO THESE SCHOOLS) AND TO PROVIDE FREE EDUCATION FOR ORPHANS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BY MEANS OF CHRISTIAN TEACHINGS, CONFERENCES, OUTDOOR MEETINGS, CHURCH SERVICES, GIVING MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC NATURE AND BY SHOWING GOD'S LOVE IN ACTION TO THE LOCAL PEOPLE IN KENYA OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES. 3. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN WESTERN KENYA (INITIALLY) BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 4. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND ASSISTING THEM TO START UP A BUSINESS. 5. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE HEALTH FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN WEBUYE AND BUNGOMA, KENYA WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. 6. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window