Dogfen lywodraethu UK ARMED FORCES POLO ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 SEP 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY’S ARMED FORCES (THE “ARMED FORCES”) BY INCREASING PHYSICAL FITNESS, FOSTERING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS AND RAISING MORALE OF MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH FACILITATING AND ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION BY MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES IN POLO AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF POLO FOR THE ARMED FORCES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.