ABOUT SPORTS LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To be able to help young people achieve their full sporting potential in a friendly comfortable environment. Educate young people by involving them in sporting activities in other parts of the world. To use sports and activity to help young people to develop their skills and capabilities to create responsibility, confidence and individuality.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 April 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dwyrain Sussex
- Gorllewin Sussex
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Llywodraethu
- 26 Tachwedd 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Mawrth 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- ASUK (Enw gwaith)
- ABOUT SPORTS LIMIKTED (Enw blaenorol)
- ABOUT SPORTS UK (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £5.39k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £4.57k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2015 | 28 Medi 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2014 | 23 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2013 | 28 Awst 2014 | 181 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, TO RELIEVE NEEDS OF AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.1 BY HELPING THEM DEVELOP THEIR SPORTING ABILITIES; 4.2 BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO KEEP PARTICIPATING IN PHYSICAL ACTIVITY THROUGH PROVISION OF FUN AND ENJOYABLE HEALTHY ACTIVITIES; 4.3 BY PROVIDING THE HIGHEST QUALITY (AND WORKING WITH) FULLY QUALIFIED COACHES, EXPERTS IN PLANNING WHO RUN A WIDE RANGE OF HEALTHY ACTIVITIES; 4.4 BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO CHOOSE HEALTHY AND POSITIVE LIFESTYLES THROUGH MENTORING AND CONSISTENT, EXPERT AND INDIVIDUAL ATTENTION; 4.5 BY HELPING THEM ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL IN A FRIENDLY COMFORTABLE ENVIRONMENT; 4.6 BY PROVIDING THEM WITH EASY ACCESS TO PROFESSIONAL MENTORING THROUGH SPORTS AND EDUCATIONAL COACHING ACTIVITIES; 4.7 BY PROVIDING HIGH QUALITY COACHING FOR ALL (AND NOT JUST FOR THE CHOSEN FEW WHO CAN AFFORD IT); 4.8 BY IMPROVING THEIR AWARENESS OF THEMSELVES AND THEIR SURROUNDINGS; 4.9 THROUGH EDUCATION BY INVOLVING THEM IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD; 4.10 BY BUILDING BONDS WITH SCHOOLS, CLUBS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITIES TO HELP THEM TO BECOME HEALTHIER AND FIT THROUGH SPORT; 4.11 BY USING SPORTS AND HEALTHY ACTIVITIES TO HELP THEM DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES TO CREATE RESPONSIBILITY, CONFIDENCE AND INDIVIDUALITY; 4.12 BY EMPOWERING THEM TO GROW AND UNDERSTAND THEIR OWN CHARACTERISTICS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS AND INDEPENDENCE SO THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR STANDING WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; AND 4.13 BY HELPING THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED THROUGH DIFFICULT CIRCUMSTANCES; FOR EXAMPLE, WHERE PARENTS ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE THROUGH ILLNESS, THROUGH SPORT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window