HOLMES CHAPEL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
? Value, celebrate and develop talents of children, young people and colleagues ? Challenge and address underachievement ? Identify and remove barriers to learning ? Promote lifelong learning through widening participation involving our community
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dwyrain Swydd Gaerlleon
Llywodraethu
- 31 Gorffennaf 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 29 Gorffennaf 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £45.59k | £169.21k | £39.69k | £54.21k | £30.93k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £45.13k | £128.58k | £37.19k | £41.05k | £54.76k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | 13 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | 13 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | 27 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | 27 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 11 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | 11 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 19 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | 19 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT MEMBER SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FAMILY SUPPORT PROJECT TO GIVE ADVICE AND COUNSELING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window