HYNDBURN ARTS TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE PERFORMING, VISUAL AND NEW MEDIA ARTS. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS, WITH A PREFERENCE TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OF AGE.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 March 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Gaerhirfryn
Llywodraethu
- 31 Hydref 2014: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1158857 HYNDBURN ARTS LIMITED
- 17 Gorffennaf 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 31 Hydref 2014: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- CIVIC ARTS CENTRE (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £76.84k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £69.85k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mawrth 2013 | 04 Ebrill 2014 | 64 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mawrth 2013 | 05 Ebrill 2014 | 65 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE PERFORMING, VISUAL AND NEW MEDIA ARTS, BY ANY MEANS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING THROUGH: - THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CIVIC ARTS CENTRE, OSWALDTWISTLE; - THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF PLAYS, PRODUCTIONS AND SHOWS; AND - THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS, WITH A PREFERENCE TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OF AGE, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window