Dogfen lywodraethu THE COLLEGE OF PODIATRY TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/12/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4. OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY 4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES AND CONDITIONS OF THE FOOT AND ASSOCIATED STRUCTURES; 4.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PODIATRIC HEALTH RELATING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PREVENTION AND THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES AND CONDITIONS OF THE FOOT AND ASSOCIATED STRUCTURES; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SCHOLARLY ACTIVITY FOR PODIATRISTS WITH A VIEW TO RAISING STANDARDS OF PODIATRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 4.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND 4.1.5 THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.