Dogfen lywodraethu GLOBAL DIPLOMATIC FORUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR IN DIPLOMACY; (2) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH ON DIPLOMACY (PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT); AND (3) THE PROMOTION OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND/OR RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY UNDERTAKING THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: ·RESEARCHING THE CONFLICT RESOLUTION DISCOURSES IN PAST CONFLICTS AND THEIR POSSIBLE APPLICATION TO CURRENT CONFLICTS; ·RESEARCHING THE CAUSES OF THE CONFLICTS AND IDENTIFYING POSSIBLE SCENARIOS FOR SOLUTIONS; ·ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS TO IDENTIFY THE CAUSES OF CONFLICTS AND THE DIFFERENT POSSIBLE RESOLUTIONS; ·ORGANISING PLATFORMS FOR PARTIES INVOLVED IN A CONFLICT TO DISCUSS RECOMMENDATIONS AND POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS; AND ·DRAWING LESSONS FROM THE CURRENT CONFLICTS TO PREVENT SIMILAR CONFLICTS IN THE FUTURE. THE COMPANY WILL REMAIN IMPARTIAL IN PURSUING THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
CITY OF LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.