THE ACES CHARITABLE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Although the Charity shall be for general Charitable purposes as above the Charity shall lay particular emphasis on supporting medical related Charitable causes and in particular medical causes related to conditions of the eye.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2016
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
- Swydd Gaergrawnt
- Swydd Lincoln
Llywodraethu
- 18 Mehefin 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Rhagfyr 2019: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £13 | £0 | £0 | £16 | £17 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | 27 Medi 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 19 Gorffennaf 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEB 2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR. 3.3 ALTHOUGH THE CHARITY SHALL BE FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ABOVE THE CHARITY SHALL LAY PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON SUPPORTING MEDICAL RELATED CHARITABLE CAUSES AND IN PARTICULAR MEDICAL CAUSES RELATED TO CONDITIONS OF THE EYE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window