LIGHTHOUSE MINISTRIES UK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Lead tenant of a Community Centre, available for local groups who serve residents of the local area. We are a Christian group who use gifts to our para church activities to ensure that the centre can be provided at a low charge to encourage its use in a deprived area.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cumbria
Llywodraethu
- 15 Awst 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Tachwedd 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.04k | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £4.25k | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 18 Hydref 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 25 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 14 Tachwedd 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 02 Awst 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
31. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE ONE. 3.2 (I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ROOSEGATE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3.2 (II)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. PLEASE ENSURE THAT THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS ENTERED AT CLAUSE 2(I) ABOVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window