Dogfen lywodraethu TOTNES AND DISTRICT SHOW SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL HUSBANDRY, HORTICULTURE AND FORESTRY IN ALL THEIR RESPECTIVE ASPECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SOUTH HAMS AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR: TO CONDUCT, HOLD, PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE CONDUCT, HOLDING AND PROMOTING OF SHOWS, EXHIBITIONS AND COMPETITIONS CONNECTED WITH THE USER OF AGRICULTURAL LAND IN ALL ITS ASPECTS WHETHER FOR THE PURPOSE OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL HUSBANDRY, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY, RECREATION OR OTHERWISE INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE CONDUCT, HOLDING AND PROMOTION FROM TIME TO TIME OF THE TOTNES & DISTRICT SHOW.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.