COUNCIL FOR THE ETHNIC MINORITIES LUSOFONIA VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS (CEMLVO)

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the general public, in particular but not exclusively the socially and economically disadvantaged members of the wider Portuguese speaking communities and their third sector organisations by; a) the promotion of the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and the effective use of resources b) the provision of capacity building initiatives
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 07 September 2021
Pobl

2 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Llety/tai
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Hamdden
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Angola
- Awstralia
- Brasil
- Cabo Verde
- Canada
- Chile
- Ciwba
- Congo
- De Affrica
- Ffrainc
- Gerner
- Gibraltar
- Guinea Gyhydeddol
- Guiné-bissau
- Guinée
- Gwlad Belg
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Macau
- Malaysia
- Mosambic
- Namibia
- Portiwgal
- São Tomé A Príncipe
- Sbaen
- Senegal
- Tomor-leste
- Tsieina
- Unol Daleithiau
- Yr Almaen
- Yr Iseldiroedd
Llywodraethu
- 22 Mehefin 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- CEMLVO AND LUSOPHONE ALLIANCE (ALIANCA LUSOFONA) (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
2 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PEDRO GAMMA | Ymddiriedolwr | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
RAQUEL PAIVA | Ymddiriedolwr | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 07/09/2017 | 07/09/2018 | 07/09/2019 | 07/09/2020 | 07/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £795 | £1.38k | £1.08k | £870 | £1.68k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £120 | £295 | £164 | £89 | £393 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Medi 2023 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 305 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Medi 2023 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 305 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Medi 2022 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 671 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Medi 2022 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 671 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Medi 2021 | 01 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Medi 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Medi 2020 | 12 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Medi 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Medi 2019 | 12 Ebrill 2021 | 279 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Medi 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE WIDER PORTUGUESE SPEAKING COMMUNITIES (SOMETIMES CALLED PALOP OR LUSOFONIA OR LUSOPHONE), AND THE THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS THAT REPRESENTS THEM AND PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREAS OF ENGLAND AND WALES (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY 5(1) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVE OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE; 5(2) ASSISTING IN BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF THE THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 5(3) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE LUSOFONIA (OR LUSOPHONIA) COMMUNITIES AND OTHER COMMUNITIES, PARTICULARLY NEWLY ARRIVED REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS, ESPECIALLY BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE SERVICES, AND ADVICE AND ADVOCACY REGARDING MATTERS SUCH AS IMMIGRATION, SOCIAL AND WELFARE RIGHTS, HEALTH, HOUSING, COMMUNITY INTEGRATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT; 5(4) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND ADVICE ON HEALTH ISSUES; 5(5) THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS: (A)"THIRD SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. (B)"CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (C)"VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.”
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
JEFF KAWENDE
Flat 41
Dacre House
Beaufort Street
LONDON
SW3 5BH
- Ffôn:
- 07508790570
- E-bost:
- director@cemlvo.org.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window