LEO (DERBYSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Providing Local Enterprise Growth support in the areas of Derbyshire and Nottinghamshire. This includes the provision of free support, advice and coaching to those looking to start new businesses, especially those living in areas of high deprivation. We work with young people equipping them with enterprise skills and capabilities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Derby
- Swydd Nottingham
Llywodraethu
- 06 Mawrth 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Mai 2016: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £10.40k | £3.98k | £20 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £9.28k | £294 | £5.12k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 27 Ebrill 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 09 Gorffennaf 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 29 Medi 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO: 4.1 THE PROMOTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.1.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 4.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 4.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR (B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 4.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; AND 4.1.6 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION. 4.2 THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACTIY AND SKILLS FO THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS, THE CHARITY SHALL AT ALL TIMES ACTIVELY PROMOTE AND TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION THE PRINCIPLES OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window