THE KESTRELMAN TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Trustees shall apply on an international basis the income and capital of the Trust for the following charitable purposes - Environment, Social Inclusion, Education & the Arts and Relief for Refugees & those in need. This will be achieved by the awarding of grants to appropriate organisations operating within the above areas and the subsequent monitoring of the impact the grants have made.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2023
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Llety/tai
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Cernyw
- Dinas Bryste
- Dinas Llundain
- Dinas Westminster
- Islington
- Newham
- Sir Fynyw
- Surrey
- Swydd Lincoln
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Botswana
- Brasil
- Burkina Faso
- Bwrwndi
- Byrma
- Camerwn
- Cenia
- Congo
- Congo (Gweriniaeth Ddemocrataidd)
- De Affrica
- Djibouti
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea Gyhydeddol
- Guiné-bissau
- Guinée
- Gweriniaeth Canol Affrica
- Gweriniaeth De Swdan
- Gwlad Pwyl
- Gwlad Swazi
- India
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libia
- Madagasgar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Moroco
- Mosambic
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Periw
- Reunion
- Rwanda
- São Tomé A Príncipe
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- St Helena
- Tanzania
- Tchad
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Twrci
- Uganda
- Y Comoros
- Y Gambia
- Yr Aifft
- Y Swdan
- Y Traeth Ifori
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Llywodraethu
- 05 Rhagfyr 2012: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger John Manser | Cadeirydd | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Julian Robert Marzec Manser | Ymddiriedolwr | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MARIA MARZEC MANSER | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
TOMAS JAN MARZEC MANSER | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £35.56k | £23.53k | £9.68k | £6.20k | £4.64k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £501.92k | £570.35k | £441.27k | £441.18k | £175.27k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2023 | 02 Gorffennaf 2024 | 2 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | 23 Mai 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | 15 Mawrth 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 12 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 15 Mai 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | 15 Mai 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY:(A)THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES;(B)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES;(C)THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION.(D)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, ALL ASPECTS OF WASTE GENERATION, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND WASTE RECYCLING AND THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.(E)THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS;(F)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF FURNITURE, CLOTHES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS.(G)FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.)(2)SOCIAL INCLUSION(A)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.(B)FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).(3)EDUCATION & THE ARTS(A)FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING)OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT,INCLUDING BY:I.AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION;II.PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS),TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT(B)TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF:I.ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; II.ADVANCING EDUCATION; III. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; IV. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.(C)TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUPPORTING UNDERFUNDED ARTS FACILITIES AND TO SUPPORT THE USE OF ART TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF OFFENDERS, SECURE PATIENTS AND DETAINEES.(4)RELIEF FOR REFUGEES & THOSE IN NEED(A)THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE,OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS.(B)TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD OR THOSE GRANTED ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.(C)THE RELIEF OF CHARITABLE NEED OF HOMELESS PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING,FOOD AND REHABILITATION,INCLUDING ADVICE ON ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ABUSE, HOUSING AND EMPLOYMENT.(D)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND POVERTY,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SIMPLE TECHNOLOGY.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
10 St. Georges Yard
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU9 7LW
- Ffôn:
- 01252718638
- E-bost:
- trustadmin@griersondickens.co.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window