Dogfen lywodraethu Brave Futures

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JUL 2018 as amended on 19 Sep 2018 as amended on 26 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR THOSE CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 18 YEARS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM SEXUAL ABUSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR ADULTS WHO ARE SURVIVORS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT. THE RELIEF OF PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 18 YEARS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM SEXUAL ABUSE BY PROVIDING ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND EDUCATION PROGRAMMES TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERSTAND AND HELP OVERCOME THE PROBLEMS FACED BY THE CHILDREN IN THEIR CARE. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM SEXUAL BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS ARISING FROM LIFE EXPERIENCES BY ACTING AS A RESOURCE FOR THE TREATMENT OF THOSE CHILDREN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.