FAST PROJECT - LONDON
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
EQUIPPING PEOPLE IN AND AROUND THE PATMORE ESTATE LONDON TO POSITIVELY CONTRIBUTE TO THE TRANSFORMATION OF THEIR OWN LIVES, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITY. BUILDING A SAFE AND HEALTHY ENVIRONMENT TOGETHER WHERE ALL BELONG AND SHARE HOPE FOR THE FUTURE. INCLUDING OUTREACH, SPORT, MENTORING, EMPLOYABILITY, FILM, TRIPS & COMMUNITY EVENTS.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Llywodraethu
- 30 Tachwedd 2015: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1152146 E:MERGE (UK) LIMITED
- 26 Hydref 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 30 Tachwedd 2015: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £22.80k | £35.02k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £14.26k | £36.31k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 13 Tachwedd 2015 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 01 Awst 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 01 Awst 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 27 Tachwedd 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 13 Awst 2013 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/10/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS) ARE UNDERTAKEN WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 1)TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH:(A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window