Dogfen lywodraethu CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY CHURCH (WALES)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2014 as amended on 14 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROPAGATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO SPREAD THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AS REVEALED THROUGH THE HOLY SCRIPTURES BY MEANS OF COMMUNICATION,WHETHER VISUAL,VERBAL OR WRITTEN.TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELEIVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS,GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND,INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH PASTORAL CARE AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.