Dogfen lywodraethu SINAI SYNAGOGUE, LEEDS
Rhif yr elusen: 1149738

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUN 2017 as amended on 09 Dec 2020 as amended on 26 May 2022 as amended on 18 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SYNAGOGUE ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PLACE OR PLACES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND TO FURTHER OR ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES OF THE JEWISH FAITH.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.