THE TRIMLEY STATION COMMUNITY TRUST LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To preserve for the benefit of the people of East Anglia and of the Nation, the historical, architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in and around East Anglia in buildings of particular beauty or historical,architectural or constructional interest, to advance education and provide facilities for social welfare.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hamdden
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Suffolk
Llywodraethu
- 19 Ebrill 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 23 Hydref 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.54k | £7.08k | £2.42k | £1.44k | £125 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.19k | £2.18k | £2.02k | £582 | £6.68k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 18 Tachwedd 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 13 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 19 Rhagfyr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JAN 2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF EAST ANGLIA AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND EAST ANGLIA IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TRIMLEY ST MARY, TRIMLEY ST MARTIN, FELIXSTOWE, KIRTON OR THE RESIDENTS OF SUFFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AT TRIMLEY RAILWAY STATION, OR ELSEWHERE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window