BARKING KIDZ KLUB
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Barking Kidz Klub is fun and exciting club for 5 to 11 years old. It uses games, competitions, songs, stories and drama and introduce the Christian Faith to local kids in an unthreatening, fun and friendly manner. The main areas of our work: Weekly Kidz Klub sessions Weekly home visits to children and families Community work and events School work
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Barking And Dagenham
Llywodraethu
- 15 Chwefror 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1015872 KING'S CHURCH,BARKING
- 05 Rhagfyr 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 15 Chwefror 2024: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (GI))
- KIDZ KLUB BARKING (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £4.14k | £3.95k | £3.70k | £3.77k | £2.62k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £5.23k | £4.01k | £3.65k | £3.20k | £2.33k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 10 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 08 Chwefror 2022 | 100 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 24 Mawrth 2021 | 144 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE CONSTITUTION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window