GLOBAL AID UK

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
UK - centres for learning,recreation,advice. BANGLADESH:Water&Energy Fund - tube wells,gas,electric,solar. Medical Fund - clinics,mobile medics. Family Welfare Fund - nursery,community centre,marriage & legal aid. Sports&Fitness Fund - sports academies. Education Fund - academies,teacher training,equipment,scholarship. Poverty&Disaster Fund - food & sanitation packs,shelter huts,orphanages.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2024
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Llety/tai
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Hamdden
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Canol Swydd Bedford
- Dinas Bradford
- Luton
- Rochdale
- Swydd Hertford
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Algeria
- Bangladesh
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brasil
- Byrma
- Cambodia
- Congo (Gweriniaeth Ddemocrataidd)
- Groeg
- Gweriniaeth Canol Affrica
- India
- Indonesia
- Liberia
- Pakistan
- Philipinas
- Sierra Leone
- Syria
- Tiriogaethau Palesteina
Llywodraethu
- 13 Chwefror 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- HELP4UMMAH WELFARE FOUNDATION (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HABIB-UR-RAHMAN TALUQDAR | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jahid Choudhury | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
NURUL AHMED | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
NAZRUL ISLAM | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 December 2012 |
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD KAYSAR HUSSAIN | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEIKH MUHAMMAD MUBIN AHMED | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.73k | £2.26k | £940 | £1.82k | £2.35k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.51k | £1.90k | £765 | £1.55k | £2.10k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2024 | 28 Mawrth 2025 | 51 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2023 | 24 Medi 2024 | 232 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2022 | 13 Mawrth 2023 | 36 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2021 | 29 Mawrth 2022 | 52 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 05 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 23/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: ·PROVIDING LOCAL NETWORK GROUPS AND TRAINING CENTRES THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; ·PROVIDING COMMUNITY CENTRES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. ·INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. 2.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISASTER, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, THOSE IN NEED AND RURAL DEVELOPMENT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, SPECIALLY FOR THE ELDERLY, ORPHANS, WIDOWS AND THE HOMELESS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE, ADVICE AND COUNSELLING, EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS OR MEDICAL AID AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, FOR PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY; ·AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIP, ACCOMMODATION AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION AND SUPPORT IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. ·MOTIVATE LEARNING BY RUNNING CLASSES, AFTER-SCHOOL CLUBS OR WORKSHOPS FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE ILLITERATE OR INNUMERATE OR NO LONGER IN EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, LIFE SKILLS TRAINING AND TO PROMOTE THE VALUE OF EDUCATION AND SOCIAL INTEGRATION AND HARMONY. ·SUPPORTING A SCHOOL OVERSEAS, INCLUDING BUILDING OR MAINTAINING SCHOOLS AND SUPPORTING TEACHER TRAINING FOR SCHOOLS OVERSEAS. 4.TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION AND TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, INTER-FAITH OR PEACE CONFERENCES, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM AND TO PROMOTE RESPECT OF OTHER RELIGIONS OR BELIEFS. 5.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION, PARTICULARLY THE UNDER PRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MULTI-SPORT ACADEMIES AND SPORTS ACTIVITIES.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
18 Haig Close
ST. ALBANS
AL1 5RG
- Ffôn:
- 07956304567
- E-bost:
- kaysar_@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window