THE RESPECT4US CHARITABLE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Trust has applied for a number of grants to support the work of Respect4us with disadvantaged and vulnerable young people. These grants have enabled it to set up a wooden products enterprise, buy a range cooker to feed the YP and develop their life skills, to support its "Olympics for All" programme, and to provide on-going support for YP beyond the school leaving age.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Llywodraethu
- 08 Ionawr 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Awst 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- RESPECT4US (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £14.50k | £14.51k | £18.00k | £2.00k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £13.25k | £11.62k | £11.30k | £12.44k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 18 Medi 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 OCT 2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
*** IN LIQUIDATION*** TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD BY PREVENTING YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 12-18 FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: EXCLUSION FROM SCHOOL NON-ATTENDANCE AT SCHOOL POOR EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES FAMILY LIFE STYLE FAMILY BREAKDOWN SUBSTANCE ABUSE INVOLVEMENT IN CRIME AND ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window