Dogfen lywodraethu THE MY HOME LIFE ESSEX COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 SEP 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY HELPING OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AS A RESULT OF THEIR PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL DISABILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE LIVING IN RESIDENTIAL CARE SETTINGS IN ESSEX, TO ENGAGE MEANINGFULLY AND RE-INTEGRATE AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROMOTING, INCREASING OR CO-ORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THESE OLDER PEOPLE TO ENGAGE WITH INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS IN THEIR WIDER COMMUNITIES ACCORDING TO THEIR NEEDS, INTERESTS AND PREFERENCES, AND TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THEIR OWN CONTRIBUTIONS TO THEIR WIDER COMMUNITIES IF THEY SO WISH. B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE WORK AND DAY TO DAY LIFE FOR OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN RESIDENTIAL CARE SETTINGS AND THE NEEDS OF THE RESIDENTS TO ENCOURAGE VOLUNTEERING AND ENABLE THESE RESIDENTS IN PRACTICAL WAYS TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. C) RECRUITING, TRAINING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTEERS TO BEFRIEND AND SUPPORT OLDER PEOPLE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.