Dogfen lywodraethu Danson Sports Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/04/2013 as amended on 01 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.