CROSSROADS GLOBAL VILLAGE (UK)

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
A non-profit brokerage helping link for-profit entities, with non-profit organisations, foundations, trusts and governments to combat global need. In addition Global Handicrafts operating on a fair trade basis, sells gifts and items in the UK; and Global X-perience programmes simulating poverty, hunger, oppression and the plight of refugees enabling participants to experience such need first hand.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
1 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 20 Awst 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- CROSSROADS; CROSSROADS GLOBAL VILLAGE; CROSSROADS FOUNDATION; GLOBAL HAND; GLOBAL HAND (UK) (Enw gwaith)
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BILL HAMPSON | Cadeirydd | 22 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Kim Elizabeth Elwell-Sutton | Ymddiriedolwr | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin James Dillon | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Payne | Ymddiriedolwr | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Natalya Hanley | Ymddiriedolwr | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Caroline Davis | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £19.78k | £24.01k | £26.62k | £38.78k | £28.54k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £19.62k | £21.96k | £29.50k | £52.45k | £25.17k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 29 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 29 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 27 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 27 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 25 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 25 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 30 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 20 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR BY FACILITATING THE DONATION OF GOODS, SERVICES, EXPERTISE AND SKILLS, AND THE PRACTICAL INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT OF COMPANIES, FIRMS AND INDIVIDUALS, IN FURTHERING THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF: (A) RELIEVING AND ASSISTING THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT AND NATURAL, MAN-MADE OR COMPLEX DISASTER, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE; (B) PREVENTING AND RELIEVING POVERTY IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR BY ACTIVITIES THAT HELP ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND DISEASE IN RESOURCE POOR SETTINGS IN THE WORLD; (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (D) ADVANCING HEALTH OR SAVING LIVES; (E) RELIEVING THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; (F) ADVANCING HUMAN RIGHTS, CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR RECONCILIATION OR PROMOTING RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY OR EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (G) ADVANCING ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT; OR (H) PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR. 2. TO PROMOTE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT AND NATURAL, MAN-MADE OR COMPLEX DISASTER BY AID AND TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY, TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES, TO ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT, AND TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING EXPERIENTIAL LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, FACILITIES AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES WHICH ENABLE PARTICIPANTS TO DEVELOP THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF AND EMPATHY TOWARDS ISSUES RELATING TO POVERTY, HUMANITARIAN NEED AND DISASTER RESPONSE. VOLUNTARY SECTOR SHALL MEAN ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHICH ARE FURTHERING PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW AND OTHER INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH IN EACH CASE ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR DOES NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Capital Office
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Ffôn:
- 020 3389 7177
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window