Dogfen lywodraethu AURORA NEW DAWN

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/07/2013 as amended on 30 Oct 2023 as amended on 04 Sept 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
“(1) the relief of adults, children and young people who are subjected to, or who are at risk of being subjected to or affected by domestic abuse, including coercive and controlling behaviour, and or, sexual abuse, violence, stalking and harassment, in particular but not exclusively by providing information, advice and other support services. (2) the advancement of education and training for the public benefit in the issues surrounding domestic abuse, including coercive and controlling behaviour, sexual abuse, violence, stalking and harassment.”
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.