BURTON STREET ANGELS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
As an expression of Christian faith, to promote the physical, mental and spiritual health and wellbeing of people using Burton town center in the late evening, by the provision of pastoral care, a compassionate listening ear, practical assistance where able and information/signposting to other services, regardless of a person's age, gender, race, religion, sexual identity, background or ability.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Stafford
Llywodraethu
- 03 Medi 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 17 Chwefror 2023: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- BSA (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £551 | £841 | £1.36k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.90k | £2.26k | £1.79k | £507 | £281 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 03 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 21 Mawrth 2022 | 49 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 01 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 30 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 08/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE FOLLOWING OBJECT IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN BURTON UPON TRENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF SUCH COMMUNITY, TO SUPPORT, CARE AND TREAT PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS AND SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH :- TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AND THE FORMATION OF A STREET ANGELS PROGRAMME PROVIDING A COMPASSIONATE LISTENING EAR FOR ALL PROBLEMS AND PRACTICAL ADVICE ON STAYING SAFE ON THE STREETS SUCH AS CONTACT DETAILS FOR TAXI FIRMS / EXTERNAL AGENCIES, WARM DRINKS, FLIP FLOPS ETC AND SIMPLE FIRST AID MAY BE ADMINISTERED BY THOSE WHO HAVE HAD APPROPRIATE TRAINING.
Maes buddion
BURTON UPON TRENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window