Dogfen lywodraethu FURTHER EDUCATION TRUST FOR LEADERSHIP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 OCT 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: 1.1 FOSTERING AND SUPPORTING LEADERSHIP SCHOLARSHIP, RESEARCH AND THINKING IN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR AND BEING AN INDEPENDENT THINK TANK; 1.2 ACTING AS A LEGACY BODY OF THE LEARNING AND SKILLS IMPROVEMENT SERVICE; 1.3 SUPPORTING THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY AND SUCCESS RATES OF ITS PROVISION FOR THE BENEFIT OF LEARNERS, EMPLOYERS AND THE COMMUNITY TO SUPPORT ADVANCEMENT WITHIN THE SECTOR AND TO ENHANCE ITS REPUTATION; 1.4 SUPPORTING AND ENABLING THE DEVELOPMENT OF SELF REGULATION, GOVERNANCE AND INDEPENDENCE WITHIN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR AND ACTING AS AN IMPROVEMENT BODY, PROVIDING SUPPORT AT NATIONAL, INTERNATIONAL, REGIONAL, LOCAL AND INDIVIDUAL LEVELS; 1.5 ENCOURAGING, PROMOTING, DEVELOPING, PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN RAISING STANDARDS WITHIN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR AND HELPING ORGANISATIONS AND LEADERS RESPOND TO AND PREPARE FOR POLICY REFORMS IN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR; 1.6 FOSTERING AND SUPPORTING LEADERSHIP IMPROVEMENT, ADVANCEMENT AND TRANSFORMATION IN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR AND SUPPORTING NATIONAL STRATEGIES FOR LEADERSHIP OF TEACHING AND LEARNING; 1.7 SUPPORTING CO-OPERATIVE DEVELOPMENTS ACROSS THE FURTHER EDUCATION, HIGHER EDUCATION AND SCHOOLS SECTOR; 1.8 CONTRIBUTING FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE CAPACITY AND PERFORMANCE IMPROVEMENT OF SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS AND TRAINING ORGANISATIONS AND TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN PARTICULAR BY RUNNING A LEADERSHIP COLLEGE FOR MANAGEMENT AND LEADERSHIP DEVELOPMENT IN EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND 1.9 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ALL THOSE WORKING IN THE FIELD OF LIFELONG LEARNING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.