Dogfen lywodraethu EUROPEAN SCHOOL OF ECONOMICS UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF ECONOMICS, FINANCE, MANAGEMENT, ENTERTAINMENT, MUSIC, POLITICS, SOCIAL STUDIES, CULTURE, LINGUISTICS, COMMUNICATION AND OTHER RELATED AREAS, INCLUDING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF UNIVERSITIES, EDUCATIONAL COLLEGES AND ORGANISATIONS TO TEACH AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH IN ALL AREAS OF EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.