Dogfen lywodraethu MAIDSTONE WIND SYMPHONY
Rhif yr elusen: 1156003

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 04/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/2015 as amended on 16 Oct 2018 as amended on 09 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN SUCH A WAY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.