Dogfen lywodraethu THE WEST LONDON SYNAGOGUE OF BRITISH JEWS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JUN 2020 as amended on 12 Oct 2021 as amended on 04 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the charity ("Objects") are: I. to promote and foster the Jewish religion by the provision and maintenance of a public place of worship consistent with the principles, practices, values and traditions of reform Judaism; II. to promote and co-ordinate the education and religious instruction of Jews; and III. such other charitable purposes for the public benefit, in particular, the benefit of the Jewish people in the UK, in Israel or elsewhere in the world, which are charitable according to the laws of England and Wales.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.