WEST MOOR RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We provide activities and new experiences to people in the local community. Activities include toddler groups, carpet bowls, youth clubs, womens group, craft club, slimming club, summer playscheme, lunch clubs, trips, Christmas lunches and anything else that people ask that they would like to try and revenue permits.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gogledd Tyneside
Llywodraethu
- 22 Chwefror 2016: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1163694 WEST MOOR RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
- 24 Chwefror 1975: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Chwefror 2016: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £77.20k | £72.91k | £76.81k | £87.09k | £90.62k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £75.93k | £66.26k | £66.89k | £92.08k | £82.72k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 14 Gorffennaf 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 14 Gorffennaf 2015 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 22 Mehefin 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 23 Mehefin 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 24 Mehefin 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 26 Mehefin 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 06 Medi 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 07 Mehefin 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1970
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST MOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUTENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
WEST MOOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window