Dogfen lywodraethu WINDSOR CHRISTIAN ACTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 23 OCT 2013 AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2017 as amended on 09 Oct 2018 as amended on 05 Nov 2020 as amended on 05 Nov 2020 as amended on 06 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 . THE RELIEF OF ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO HOMELESS ADULTS AND THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS IN WINDSOR; 2. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN WINDSOR, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.