Dogfen lywodraethu Goleudy Housing and Support Limited

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/11/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 2016 as amended on 23 Jun 2020 as amended on 23 Jan 2023 as amended on 10 Dec 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND OLD AGE IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING WORDS) FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY ARE UNABLE TO FULFIL THEIR DUTIES AS CITIZENS OR THEIR OBLIGATIONS TO THEIR EMPLOYERS.
Maes buddion
SOUTH WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.