ONE YOUTH DANCE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We work with young people aged 11 - 19 and aim to reach those on the edge of society through dance. We provide weekly dance sessions, mentoring, emotional support, and performance opportunities throughout the year. In our short history we've worked with almost 500 young people and seen every dancer who has wished to progress onto further education within the performing arts.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £33.33k | £37.33k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £25.51k | £41.45k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2015 | 13 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2015 | 08 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2014 | 11 Mai 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2014 | 11 Mai 2015 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 10/12/2013 AMENDED ON 06/01/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS,ESPECIALLY THE PERFORMING ARTS,AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window