Dogfen lywodraethu BURTON JOYCE & DISTRICT U3A
Rhif yr elusen: 1157213

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 AUG 2008 AS AMENDED ON 13 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED ON 11 AUG 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN BURTON JOYCE, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.