CHRISTCHURCH COMMUNITY COFFEE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To advance the Christian religion and to provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Llywodraethu
- C.C.COFFEE (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £75.14k | £78.11k | £81.59k | £87.93k | £90.51k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £70.81k | £79.23k | £85.13k | £88.20k | £90.89k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jan 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN CAFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window