Dogfen lywodraethu LEEDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2021 as amended on 15 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ASSIST, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE EDUCATIONAL WORK) OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF LEEDS, AND ANY OTHER DIOCESE WHICH SHALL AT ANY TIME BE FORMED, WHOLLY OR IN PART OUT OF TE DIOCESE, EITHER WITH OR WITHOUT THE ADDITION OF ANY PART OR PARTS OF OTHER DIOCESES.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.