Dogfen lywodraethu NEWCASTLE THEATRE ROYAL TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/06/1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2015 as amended on 30 Jul 2019 as amended on 13 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE,MAINTAIN,IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS,INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA,MIME,DANCE,SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE,PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDING THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.