THE JIGSAW PROJECT
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To help young people, within the context of Christian values, through the provision of recreational, educational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life and providing support and activities which develop their skill capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Southend-on-sea
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £13.93k | £3.89k | £10.68k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £25.64k | £1.73k | £9.53k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2017 | 02 Ebrill 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2016 | 07 Mawrth 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2015 | 15 Ebrill 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF CHRISTIAN VALUES, THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILL CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window