Dogfen lywodraethu FLOREAT EDUCATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/01/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/07/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: • PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH PURPOSES INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING MODELS OF GOOD PRACTICE AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES GENERALLY TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS; • ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO WORK OR VOLUNTEER IN, OR GOVERN, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS TO DELIVER A HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION TO THE PUPILS AND COMMUNITIES SERVED BY THOSE INSTITUTIONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.