Dogfen lywodraethu BRO MYRDDIN BOWLS CLUB
Rhif yr elusen: 1158270

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 18 AUG 2014 AMENDED ON 25/11/2015 AMENDED ON 29 NOV 2017 as amended on 30 Nov 2019 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARMARTHEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF WEST WALES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.