EARLY LIFE NUTRITION NETWORK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Early Life Nutrition network was created with the aim of improving nutrition in early life. It was launched with 300 healthcare stakeholders, discussing the problem of how to improve behaviors surrounding nutrition in early life. It is a virtual community whose activities include sharing best practice and working globally across disciplines to effect behaviour change in this field.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Affganistan
- Albania
- Algeria
- Ariannin
- Awstralia
- Awstria
- Bahrain
- Brasil
- Bwlgaria
- Camerwn
- Canada
- Cenia
- Chile
- Colombia
- Cyprus
- Denmarc
- Ethiopia
- Ffrainc
- Ghana
- Groeg
- Gwlad Belg
- Gwlad Pwyl
- Gwlad Thai
- Hwngari
- India
- Indonesia
- Irac
- Iran
- Ireland
- Israel
- Libia
- Lithwania
- Malaysia
- Mecsico
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Oman
- Portiwgal
- Rwmania
- Rwsia
- Sawdi-arabia
- Sbaen
- Seland Newydd
- Senegal
- Singapore
- Sweden
- Tsieina
- Twrci
- Uganda
- Ukrain
- Unol Daleithiau
- Y Ffindir
- Yr Aifft
- Yr Alban
- Yr Almaen
- Yr Eidal
- Yr Emiraethau Arabaidd Unedig
- Yr Iseldiroedd
- Y Swistir
- Y Weriniaeth Tsiec
Llywodraethu
- 26 Gorffennaf 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1160373 THE POWER OF NUTRITION
- 17 Mawrth 2015: CIO registration
- 26 Gorffennaf 2021: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
- ELN NETWORK (Enw gwaith)
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £508.68k | £48.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £276.63k | £207.36k | £57.25k | £7.81k | £2.76k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £508.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 21 Ebrill 2021 | 172 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 21 Ebrill 2021 | 172 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 16 Mawrth 2020 | 137 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 16 Mawrth 2020 | 137 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 12 Mehefin 2019 | 224 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
31 Rhagfyr 2017
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
12 Mehefin 2019 | 224 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Mar 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: -IMPROVING KNOWLEDGE OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS TO HELP THEM CHANGE BEHAVIOURS IN THEIR PATIENTS AND THE GENERAL POPULATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE GLOBAL HEALTH OUTCOMES. -IMPROVING NUTRITION IN EARLY LIFE BY BRINGING TOGETHER HEALTHCARE WORKERS FROM ACROSS THE WORLD AND ACROSS DISCIPLINES TO ALLOW BEST PRACTICES FROM ONE REGION OR DISCIPLINE TO BE USED ELSEWHERE BY POOLING RESOURCES, FUELLING DISCUSSION AND DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE. -IMPROVING THE STANDARD AND QUALITY OF CARE FOR THE LONG TERM HEALTH BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS’ KNOWLEDGE OF BEST PRACTICE, POSSIBLE INTERVENTIONS, AND BEHAVIOUR CHANGE INTERVENTIONS ACROSS THE GLOBE. -HELPING TO DELIVER BETTER PATIENT OUTCOMES AND THUS HAVE A POSITIVE INFLUENCE ON THE LONG TERM HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGH KNOWLEDGE SHARING. -IMPROVING THE POPULATION’S GENERAL HEALTH IN THE LONG-TERM AND ALLEVIATING OVERBURDENED HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS BY ADOPTING KNOWLEDGE AND EVIDENCE BASED PRACTICE TO INFLUENCE NUTRITION IN EARLY LIFE POSITIVELY ACROSS A GLOBAL COMMUNITY. -IMPROVING THE POPULATION’S GENERAL HEALTH IN THE LONG TERM BY UNDERSTANDING THE BEST WAYS OF GETTING THE MESSAGE OUT AND CHANGING PEOPLE’S BEHAVIOUR BY BRINGING TOGETHER KEY OPINION LEADERS FROM ACROSS THE WORLD TO DISCUSS, AGREE AND IMPLEMENT PLANS OF ACTION.”.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window