JUBILEE+

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Charity's Objects are to promote social inclusion for the public benefit, particularly but not exclusively by providing networking, education and training, to prevent people from becoming socially excluded focusing on ways and means of relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, in accordance with Christian principles.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

7 Ymddiriedolwyr
5 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 06 Ionawr 2015: Cofrestrwyd
- JUBILEE PLUS (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
7 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM NEIL ANNS | Cadeirydd | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Samuel John Ward | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Jayne Osborn | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Susmitha Joanna Bleasdale | Ymddiriedolwr | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Biggs | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Welch | Ymddiriedolwr | 29 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr ANDREW JOHN MCWILLIAM | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 June 2013 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £80.27k | £121.84k | £107.92k | £125.54k | £306.27k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £75.11k | £108.39k | £88.00k | £117.24k | £186.41k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 17 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 17 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 28 Tachwedd 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 28 Tachwedd 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 13 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 13 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 21 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 21 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | 26 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | 26 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/11/2014 as amended on 15 Jan 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity's objects, being undertaken in accordance with Christian principles and practices and in such a way that demonstrates Christian faith, care and concern, and upholds the values of equality and justice, are as specifically restricted to the following: 1. To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, in particular but not exclusively by: undertaking and supporting research into factors that contribute to social exclusion and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these providing education, training, grants and services to individuals, charities or other organisations working to promote social inclusion hosting conferences and seminars to raise awareness of factors that contribute to social exclusion and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these seeking to influence the public, decision-makers, politicians or public servants in support of promoting social inclusion, and responding to consultations carried out by political parties in relation to promoting social inclusion insofar as it is legitimate for a charity to do so. For the purpose of this clause, 'socially excluded' means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency including alcohol or drugs; discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender reassignment; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards); crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society). 2. The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship, in particular but not exclusively by: undertaking and supporting research into factors that contribute to the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these providing education, training, grants and services to individuals, charities or other organisations working for the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship hosting conferences and seminars to raise awareness of factors that contribute to the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these seeking to influence the public, decision-makers, politicians or public servants in support of the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship, and responding to consultations carried out by political parties in relation to the prevention or relief of poverty insofar as it is legitimate for a charity to do so. 3. To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Ethos Statement appearing in the Schedule.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
The Hastings Centre
The Ridge
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 2SA
- Ffôn:
- 01424 755990
- E-bost:
- admin@jubilee-plus.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window