THE FRIENDS OF ST MILDRED'S, TENTERDEN KENT

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Friends of St.Mildred's was created in April 2014 to assist in the vital task of maintaining the fabric of Tenterden's ancient Grade 1 listed church. The activities have included appealing for donations and providing fund raising performances and events in the church and the local area. Funding for repairs to the church building has been provided.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 April 2024
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
20 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Caint
Llywodraethu
- 18 Tachwedd 2014: Cofrestrwyd
- FOSM (Enw gwaith)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Northen | Ymddiriedolwr | 17 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Stephens | Ymddiriedolwr | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN MARY CLARK | Ymddiriedolwr | 23 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Jeremy Denison Cooper | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Harry Kneller | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES MONCKTON | Ymddiriedolwr | 21 October 2016 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £22.24k | £14.91k | £31.15k | £22.02k | £46.82k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £7.20k | £37.34k | £5.96k | £6.09k | £32.46k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £600 | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2024 | 08 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2024 | 08 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2023 | 16 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2022 | 03 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2022 | 03 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2021 | 22 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2020 | 26 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 OCT 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE A)TO ADVANCE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE GRADE 1 LISTED BUILDING THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MILDRED, TENTERDEN IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH. B)IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE CHARITY MAY: (I)MAKE GRANTS OR GIFTS OF OTHER PROPERTY TO THE CLERGY, CHURCHWARDENS AND PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST MILDRED TENTERDEN EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE SAID OBJECTS, AND GENERALLY ASSIST THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH. (II)ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND EVENTS. (III)COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THE OBJECTS. CAUSE TO BE WRITTEN AND PRINTED OR OTHERWISE CIRCULATED, GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE, SUCH PAPERS, BOOKS, PERIODICALS, PAMPHLETS OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION OR FILMS, WEBSITES OR RECORDED TAPES (WHETHER AUDIO OR VISUAL OR BOTH) AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS. (IV)RAISE FUNDS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS AND THROUGH ANY LAWFUL ACTIVITY AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS. (V)INVEST THE MONIES OF THE CHARITY NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR THE SAID OBJECTS IN OR UPON SUCH INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES OR PROPERTY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, SUBJECT NEVERTHELESS OF SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IMPOSED OR REQUIRED BY LAW. (VI)DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
14 Eastwell Meadows
TENTERDEN
TN30 6QR
- Ffôn:
- 07760161536
- E-bost:
- friendsofstmildreds@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window