HEART OF GISSING

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Heart of Gissing CIO has developed and runs a Community Centre for the benefit of the inhabitants of Gissing and surrounding villages and promotes education and creative arts for the physical and social wellbeing for all and promotes conservation of the environment. It maintains the Old School and uses any surplus income to award educational bursaries for under 25's and wider community groups.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 April 2024
Pobl

12 Ymddiriedolwyr
38 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Llywodraethu
- HOG (Enw gwaith)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
12 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Richard Norman | Cadeirydd | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Heath | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Bradley-Scott | Ymddiriedolwr | 24 August 2023 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN REYNOLDS | Ymddiriedolwr | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Reynolds | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Cromley | Ymddiriedolwr | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances King | Ymddiriedolwr | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Banham | Ymddiriedolwr | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KING | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD DYKE | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL EDDINGTON | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WILLETT | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £43.40k | £35.47k | £24.98k | £29.22k | £31.42k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £27.51k | £24.69k | £21.63k | £31.24k | £22.12k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £14.00k | £18.71k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2024 | 01 Chwefror 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2024 | 01 Chwefror 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2023 | 03 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
30 Ebrill 2023
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
03 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2022 | 29 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2022 | 29 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2021 | 05 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2021 | 05 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2020 | 26 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2020 | 26 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Association Registered 11 May 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GISSING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE CREATIVE ARTS AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED; 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SURROUNDING PARISHES; 4. SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE OLD SCHOOL PREMISES (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS THEREON), THE INCOME FROM THE LETTING OF THE OLD SCHOOL PREMISES WHICH IS, IN LAW, PERMANENT ENDOWMENT MUST BE APPLIED IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO, OR WHOSE PARENTS, ARE RESIDENT IN GISSING, WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (I) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER OR HIGHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE CIO; (II) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (B) FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GISSING.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Gissing Community Building
Rectory Road
Gissing
DISS
Norfolk
IP22 5XB
- Ffôn:
- 01379677300
- E-bost:
- admin@heartofgissing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window