READING BLUE COAT AND ARCHBISHOP LAUD CHARITABLE TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The provision of a day and/or boarding school in or near Reading. The award of scholarships, bursaries or maintenance allowances.The provision of items, services and facilities at three specified Schools in Reading.The provision of financial assistance to young men and women from Reading, Wokingham or Bray to support them in training for a trade or vocation or entering into marriage.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Reading
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MICHAEL BERTRAM | Cadeirydd | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Christopher Richard Jones | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
MATTHEW WALKER | Ymddiriedolwr | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Peter Thomas | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Howard Williams | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Michael Swan | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £233.51k | £207.66k | £209.41k | £183.35k | £191.90k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £172.04k | £158.49k | £187.78k | £173.51k | £176.38k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 27 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 27 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 03 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 03 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 22 Chwefror 2023 | 22 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 22 Chwefror 2023 | 22 diwrnod yn hwyr | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 31 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 31 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 19 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 19 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Jan 2015 as amended on 12 Nov 2020 as amended on 14 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 The CIO shall comprise an amalgamation of two unincorporated charities - the Reading Blue Coat School Foundation (charity number 309024) and the Archbishop Laud Non Educational Charity (charity number 307987). Accordingly, the objects of the CIO set out below shall be a reflection of the objects of these two unincorporated charities, with separate funds being set aside for the furtherance of the respective objects. 3.2 The first object of the CIO, reflecting the object of the Reading Blue Coat School Foundation, is to advance the education of children and young people under the age of 25 years by: 3.2.1 the provision of a day and/or boarding school in or near Reading in which religious instruction in accordance with the doctrines of the Church of England shall be given; 3.2.2 the award of scholarships, bursaries or maintenance allowances to beneficiaries tenable at the School or at any university or other place of learning; provided that the charity trustees shall maintain in the School six scholarships, comprising total or partial remission of tuition or boarding fees, to beneficiaries found fit for admission to the School who reside within a ten mile radius of the School; 3.2.3 the provision of grants, outfits, clothing, tools, instruments or books to help beneficiaries on leaving the School, a university or any other educational establishment, to prepare for, or enter, a profession, trade or calling; 3.2.4 the award of scholarships or maintenance allowances to enable beneficiaries to travel abroad to pursue their education; 3.2.5 the provision, or assistance towards the provision, of facilities for recreation and social and physical training, including the provision of coaching in athletics, sports and games, for beneficiaries; 3.2.6 the provision of grants to enable beneficiaries to study music or other arts; and 3.2.7 the provision of grants, items, services and facilities at the following schools in Reading: (a) All Saints Church of England Infants School, Brownlow Road; (b) St John’s Church of England Primary School; (c) St Mary’s and All Saints Church of England Primary School; and (d) Any other school within a forty mile radius of the School at the CIO’s discretion 3.3 The second object of the CIO, reflecting the object of the Archbishop Laud Non Educational Charity, is the provision of financial assistance to young men and women between the age of 8 to 30 years inclusive, educated in, residing in or from the vicinity of Reading, to support them in training for a trade or vocation through the making of grants as follows: 3.3.1 Young men and women between the age of 16 – 30 inclusive may be awarded training grants of up to £1000 per individual, per annum, towards the cost course fees, equipment, learning resources, travel expenses or uniform required for the course, where the trustees are satisfied that the applicant has entered into a course of training and has need of financial assistance. Applicants undertaking a multi-year course are eligible for up to three grants; and 3.3.2 Girls and boys between the age of 8 – 15 inclusive may be awarded training grants of up to £300 per individual, per annum, towards the cost of course fees, equipment, learning resources, travel expenses or uniform required for the course, where the trustees are satisfied that the applicant is in education and has need of financial assistance. 3.4 Subject to Clause 5 below, the freehold land known as Reading Blue Coat School, Holme Park, Sonning Lane, Sonning, Reading, Berkshire, RG4 6SU, registered under Land Registry title number BK371516 and the buildings thereon (vested in the Official Custodian for Charities by an Order of 8 June 1996) (“the Property”), must be retained by the charity trustees for use as a school in accordance with Clause 3.2.1 above.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
READING BLUE COAT SCHOOL
HOLME PARK
SONNING LANE
SONNING
READING
RG4 6SU
- Ffôn:
- 01189335808
- E-bost:
- bursar@rbcs.org.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window