SEND FAMILY VOICES
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We are a voluntary organisation run by parents of children and young people with special needs and disabilities. We empower families by connecting parents and carers with a wider network of support and information and we actively reach out to families to listen to their experiences and views. Using the information we gather we are able to create a strong, representative parent voice.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
Llywodraethu
- RICHMOND SEND FAMILY VOICE (Enw blaenorol)
- SEND FAMILY VOICE (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £25.76k | £49.42k | £33.28k | £1.87k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £22.79k | £34.31k | £38.62k | £14.62k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £30.00k | £30.00k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 28 Mehefin 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 28 Mehefin 2019 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 12 Mehefin 2019 | 132 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 12 Mehefin 2019 | 132 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 10 Gorffennaf 2018 | 160 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 10 Gorffennaf 2018 | 160 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 27 Mawrth 2017 | 55 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 27 Mawrth 2017 | 55 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 APR 2015 AMENDED ON 08/01/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. PROVIDING SPECIALIST ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO SUCH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES 2. WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY (ACHIEVING FOR CHILDREN) AND OTHER PUBLIC SERVICES TO DEVELOP MEASURABLE CHANGES AND IMPROVEMENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window